GA HB606 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating and establishing a purchasing department in counties of this state having a population of 200,000 or more, approved March 27, 1941 (Ga. L. 1941, p. 408), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 25, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3858) and an Act approved April 2, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 583), so as to change counties to which such Act is applicable; to change certain provisions relative to public letting and bids; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Purchasing departments; public letting and bids; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Ashe [D] | Rep. Simone Bell [D] | Rep. Elly Dobbs [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] |
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Rashad Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-28 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/34034 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb606_LC_36_1895_a_2.htm |