GA HB605 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Conference Committee Appointed 180th, 40th, 34th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Conference Committee Appointed 180th, 40th, 34th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to specific periods of limitation, so as to change provisions relating to the revival of certain claims involving childhood sexual abuse; to provide for civil actions by the Attorney General under certain circumstances; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for a report; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hidden Predator Act of 2018; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #761 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 (Y: 26 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #621 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 (Y: 26 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #621 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 180th, 40th, 34th |
2018-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hopper |