GA HB600 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Stonecrest in DeKalb County, approved April 21, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3538), so as to revise the city's voting districts; to provide a term limit for the mayor; to modify provisions related to a quorum of and voting by the governing authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stonecrest, City of; revise city's voting districts; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V9
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback