GA HB600 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the State Court of Candler County, approved July 29, 1920 (Ga. L. 1920, p. 364), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 15, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 3956), so as to change provisions relating to the compensation of the solicitor; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Candler County; compensation of solicitor; change provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #237 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #237 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 160 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-29 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-28 | House First Readers |