GA HB6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to provide for an income tax credit for investors in women owned businesses; to provide for definitions; to provide for registration with the commissioner of revenue; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for recapture; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; investors in women owned businesses; provide tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |