GA HB6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 9 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Georgia Rail Passenger Authority Law," so as to amend the authority's name to the Georgia Rail Passenger and High Speed Rail Facilities Authority; to revise the short title; to revise the legislative purpose; to revise a definition; to revise certain general powers of the authority; to revise the statement of public purpose of the authority; to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated to change references to the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Rail Passenger and High Speed Rail Facilities Authority Law; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-15HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback