GA HB596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Woodstock to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Woodstock, City of; levy an excise tax; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 272 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House First Readers |