GA HB593 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to increase the amount of the standard deduction from state taxable income for individuals; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Relief Act of 2021; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #232 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 511, Hb 593, Hb 114, Hb 271, Hb 292, Hb 374: Senate Vote #229 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #134 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-03-22 Act 6
2021-03-22HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-03-18HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-18SenateSenate Transmitted House
2021-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-18SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-17SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback