GA HB590 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Woodstock, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 4160), as amended, specifically by an Act approved May 17, 2004 (Ga. L. 2004, p. 4472), so as to change the corporate limits of the city by annexing certain territory to the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Woodstock, City of; annex certain territory; change city limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House Vote #231 - Local Calendar (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House Vote #231 - Local Calendar (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 156 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-28 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-23 | House First Readers |