GA HB577 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to labor and industrial relations, so as to enact the "Working for Two Act"; to require certain accommodations in the workplace for pregnancy, childbirth, and related conditions; to provide for the specific powers and duties of the Commissioner of Labor related to such act; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice of rights; to provide for reasonable accommodations to job applicants and employees for circumstances related to pregnancy; to impose civil penalties for certain violations; to provide for the Commissioner of Labor to promulgate certain rules and regulations; to provide for construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Working for Two Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Park Cannon [D] | Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Mary Robichaux [D] |
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55724 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/183898 |