GA HB577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Marietta, approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3541), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4561), so as to revise the provisions for the mayor pro tem and presiding officer, organizational meetings, and the board of lights and waterworks; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Marietta, City of; mayor pro tem, presiding officer, organizational meetings, and board of lights and waterworks; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-04 | Act 147 | |
2017-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House Hopper |