GA HB577 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize Rockdale County to exercise all redevelopment and other powers under Article IX, Section II, Paragraph VII(b) of the Constitution and Chapter 44 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Redevelopment Powers Law," as amended; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rockdale County; Redevelopment Powers Law; provide a referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Dickerson [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] |
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V7 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hopper |