GA HB568 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Warwick, approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 4334), so as to change the description of the council districts for the election of members of the city council to be consistent with the United States decennial census of 2010 for the State of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Warwick, City of; change description of council districts
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Rynders [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-30 | Act 120 | |
2013-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House Hopper |