GA HB556 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to labor and industrial relations, so as to enact the "Pregnancy Protection Act"; to provide for reasonable accommodations to job applicants and employees for circumstances related to pregnancy, childbirth, and related conditions; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice of rights; to provide for burden of proving undue hardship; to provide for a civil cause of action; to provide for construction; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pregnancy Protection Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback