GA HB55 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to banking and finance, so as to provide for definitions; to provide for dates; to repeal laws relating to international banking corporations and bank agencies; to provide for an exemption to installment loan licensing and regulation; to provide for notice requirements; to provide for installment loan interest calculations; to provide for licensing and regulation of foreign bank offices and agencies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banking and finance; provide for definitions; change terminology; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #204 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #23 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04 Effective Date 2023-07-01
2023-05-04 Act 348
2023-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-09SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-02SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2023-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback