GA HB548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Riverdale, approved February 13, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 2205), as amended, so as to provide for a governing authority; to create wards for the election of members of the governing authority; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election and filling vacancies; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Riverdale, City of; provide for a governing authority
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 125 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House Hopper |