GA HB545 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 41-1-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to treatment of agricultural facilities and operations and forest land as nuisances, so as to provide for legislative intent; to remove a definition; to limit the circumstances under which agricultural facilities and operations may be sued for a nuisance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nuisances; treatment of agricultural facilities and operations and forest land; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #653 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #655 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #656 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #189 (Y: 107 N: 58 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #655 (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #656 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #189 (Y: 107 N: 58 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House Hopper |