GA HB545 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Metropolitan Atlanta Aerotropolis Development Authority; to authorize such authority to undertake such activities necessary to effect the creation of economic development in the metropolitan Atlanta area; to define relevant terms; to provide that bonds be validated as authorized by Article 3 of Chapter 82 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Revenue Bond Law"; to provide for intergovernmental contracts; to provide for the creation of the Metropolitan Atlanta Aerotropolis Development Authority Project Revolving Fund; to provide for local government participation in the authority; to provide for venue of legal actions; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Metropolitan Atlanta Aerotropolis Development Authority; create
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] |
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-04 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39557 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/133342 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39557#9930 |