GA HB541 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to obstruction of public administration and related offenses, so as to provide for the offense of threatening or intimidating a law enforcement officer, public official, or other person relating to such person's involvement in a judicial proceeding; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Obstruction of public administration; threaten or intimidate officer or official; provide for offense
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Glenn Baker [D] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #844 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #551 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #823 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #551 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 636 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers |