GA HB539 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Medical Practice Act of the State of Georgia," so as to revise provisions relating to institutional licenses; to provide for a definition; to revise a provision relating to United States Drug Enforcement Administration registration; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medical Practice Act of the State of Georgia; institutional licenses; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #303 (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #129 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #129 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hopper |