GA HB534 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-9-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to additional eligibility requirements in certain counties, so as to modify the eligibility requirements; to amend Code Section 15-9-36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to judges of probate courts as clerks thereof, chief clerk, authority to appoint other clerks, powers of appointed clerks, so as to modify provisions relating to the application of the Code section; to amend Code Section 15-9-120 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions for probate courts, so as to modify provisions relating to the definition of probate court; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Eligibility requirements; probate court clerks; modify provisions
Sponsors
Sen. John Crosby [R] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] | Rep. Carol Fullerton [D] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 - Passage (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #657 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #657 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 657 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-14 | House First Readers |