GA HB531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide that no election superintendents or boards of registrars shall accept private funding; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; no election superintendents or boards of registrars shall accept private funding; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #131 (Y: 97 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback