GA HB529 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to agriculture, so as to preempt certain local ordinances relating to production of agricultural or farm products; to provide certain exemptions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; certain local ordinances; preempt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #459 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #479 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 153 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #428 - Agree Sen Am As Am (Y: 52 N: 116 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #427 - Porter Am (Y: 83 N: 81 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #426 - Porter Am Recon (Y: 86 N: 81 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #425 - Porter Am 28 0979 (Y: 81 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #331 - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #330 - Adoption Of The Amendment #1 By The Sen. From The 50th As Amended (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #224 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-01 Effective Date
2009-05-01 Act 99
2009-05-01 House Date Signed by Governor
2009-04-14 House Sent to Governor
2009-04-03 Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2009-04-03 House Conference Committee Report Adopted
2009-04-03 Senate Conference Committee Appointed
2009-04-03 House Conference Committee Appointed
2009-04-03 House Insists
2009-04-03 Senate Insists
2009-04-01 House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub
2009-03-30 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-03-30 Senate Third Read
2009-03-25 Senate Read Second Time
2009-03-25 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-12 Senate Read and Referred
2009-03-12 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-12 House Third Readers
2009-02-25 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-02-25 House Second Readers
2009-02-24 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/sum/hb529.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_LC_25_5456_a_2.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_LC_25_5586S_rcs_4.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_Sen_floor_amend_1_5.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_Sen_floor_amend_1a_6.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_LC_25_5653S_CCR_9.htm
Texthttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb529_HB_529_AP_10.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0224.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/sv0330.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/sv0331.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0425.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0426.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0427.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0428.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/hv0479.htm
Roll Callhttp://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/votes/sv0459.htm

Bill Comments

feedback