GA HB528 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Peachtree City to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peachtree City, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 296 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-21 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-04 | House | House Hopper |