GA HB521 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licenses for the practice of dentistry, so as to authorize temporary licenses for dentists licensed in other states to provide dental care to indigent populations in this state; to provide for notice; to provide for length of validity of temporary licenses; to provide for application; to provide for specified dental care; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for immunity from civil liability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; temporary licenses for dentists licensed in other states to provide dental care to indigent populations in this state; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #783 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Vote #485 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Vote #485 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-16 | Act 477 | |
2020-07-16 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |