GA HB521 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from Fulton County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in the amount of $15,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that county, approved April 20, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6583), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4010), so as to increase the exemption amount to $60,000.00 after a two-year phase-in period; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; ad valorem tax; exemption amount to $60,000 after two-year phase-in period; increase
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #123 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44311 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/149648 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44311#12352 |