GA HB52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a Small Claims Court in Clay County, approved March 18, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3545), so as to provide that the judge of the Probate Court of Clay County shall also serve as the magistrate of the Magistrate Court of Clay County on or after January 1, 2021, or upon vacancy of the office of the magistrate, whichever occurs first; to provide for the continuation in office and expiration of term of the current magistrate; to provide for the compensation of such judge for service as magistrate; to provide for nonpartisan elections to the combined position of probate judge and chief magistrate; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clay County; judge of Probate Court shall also serve as magistrate of the Magistrate Court; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 8 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |