GA HB514 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to distilled spirits, so as to authorize free tastings of distilled spirits to be conducted on the premises of distillers as a part of educational and promotional distillery tours; to define certain terms; to provide for the conditions under which such consumer tastings may be conducted; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Distilled spirits; free tastings on premises; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #651 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 9th (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #517 - Passage (Y: 146 N: 20 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 9th (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #517 - Passage (Y: 146 N: 20 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 656 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-14 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-11 | House First Readers |