GA HB511 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 12, 19, 27, 28, 31, 40, 45, 48, and 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to conservation and natural resources, domestic relations, game and fish, General Assembly, health, motor vehicles and traffic, public officers and employees, revenue and taxation, and social services, respectively, so as to provide for the establishment or revision of the Georgia Outdoor Stewardship Trust Fund, Solid Waste Trust Fund, Hazardous Waste Trust Fund, State Children's Trust Fund, Wildlife Endowment Trust Fund, Trauma Care Network Trust Fund, Transportation Trust Fund, Georgia Agricultural Trust Fund, Fireworks Trust Fund, and Georgia Transit Trust Fund as funds within the state treasury; to dedicate the proceeds of certain fees and taxes to such funds as authorized and subject to the conditions imposed by Article III, Section IX, Paragraph VI(r) of the Constitution of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State treasury; establishment or revision of certain Trust Funds; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #231 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 511, Hb 593, Hb 114, Hb 271, Hb 292, Hb 374: Senate Vote #229 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #148 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Effective Date 2022-07-01
2021-05-10 Act 290
2021-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-18SenateSenate Transmitted House
2021-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-18SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-17SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback