GA HB511 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the state employees' health insurance plan, so as to provide for a pilot program to provide coverage for bariatric surgical procedures for the treatment and management of obesity and related conditions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for requirements; to provide for a review panel; to provide for an evaluation report on the pilot program; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State employees' health insurance plan; pilot program to provide coverage for bariatric surgical procedures for treatment and management of obesity; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] |
Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #732 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #871 (Y: 133 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #237 (Y: 152 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #871 (Y: 133 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #237 (Y: 152 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 499 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Hopper |