GA HB51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions, so as to provide for the manner of reporting and investigation of certain crimes by officials and employees of postsecondary institutions in this state; to provide for a definition; to provide for penalties for violations; to provide for exceptions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary institutions; reporting and investigation of certain crimes by officials and employees; provide manner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #158 (Y: 115 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback