GA HB500 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment security, so as to change certain provisions of a definition in order to provide that services performed by an individual for wages shall be deemed to be employment unless the Department of Labor makes a contrary determination based upon evidence submitted of certain factors demonstrating that such individual has been and will continue to be free from control or direction over the performance of such services; to provide that the Department of Labor shall maintain a web based system of notifying the department of employment that is improperly reported; to provide for investigation of reports of misclassification; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment security; services performed by individual for wages shall be deemed to be employment unless Department of Labor makes a contrary determination based on evidence submitted; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2015-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2015-03-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2015-02-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback