GA HB497 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to authorize the use of certified medication aides in penal institutions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; use of certified medication aides in penal institutions; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Sen. Shelly Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #376 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #107 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #107 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 69 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hopper |