GA HB496 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Rabun County Water and Sewer Authority; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rabun County Water and Sewer Authority; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-30 | Act 103 | |
2013-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Hopper |