GA HB496 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in the City of Woodstock; to provide for a short title; to provide for the purposes of such districts; to provide for definitions; to provide for boards to administer said districts; to provide for the appointment and election of members of such boards; to provide for taxes, fees, and assessments; to provide for the boundaries of such districts; to provide for debt of such districts including bonded indebtedness; to provide for cooperation with local governments; to provide for powers of such boards; to provide for construction; to provide that no notice, proceeding, publication, or referendum shall be required; to provide for dissolutions; to provide the procedures connected with all of the foregoing; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Woodstock Community Improvement District Act of 2009; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House Vote #79 - Local Calendar (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House Vote #79 - Local Calendar (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-06 | Act 227 | |
2009-05-06 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-19 | House First Readers |