GA HB489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create the State Court of Cherokee County," approved April 15, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 4427), as amended, so as to provide for the appointment of solicitor-general investigators; to provide for qualifications; to provide for powers; to provide for a chief investigator; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cherokee County; State Court; appointment of solicitor-general investigators; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Scot Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #104 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #104 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 231 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Hopper |