GA HB484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to clarify and provide for persons who may obtain certain licenses, permits, or cards; to provide for driving safety cards for persons who are current recipients of grants of deferred action on deportation which shall operate the same as drivers' licenses; to provide for exceptions; to provide for the design of driving safety cards; to provide for special identification cards for persons who are current recipients of grants of deferred action on deportation; to provide for the design of such special identification cards; to provide for criminal penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' licenses; clarify persons who may obtain certain licenses, permits, or cards; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50984 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/166509 |