GA HB481 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding aviation, so as to provide for preemption for unmanned aircraft systems; to define a term; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Aviation; unmanned aircraft systems; provide for preemption
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #289 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #244 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #244 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 268 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Hopper |