GA HB479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide greater protections for individuals who have suffered from childhood sexual abuse; to amend Code Section 9-3-33.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to actions for childhood sexual abuse, so as to extend the statute of limitations for actions for childhood sexual abuse under certain circumstances; to clarify existing law; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for retroactive claims for childhood sexual abuse under certain circumstances; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hidden Predator Act of 2019; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - House Vote #642 (Y: 147 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback