GA HB471 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10A of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of heavy-duty motor vehicles, so as to add a definition of certain vehicles; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; heavy-duty vehicles; add a definition of certain vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #664 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House Hopper |