GA HB465 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to enact the "Georgia Water Customer Bill of Rights Act"; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for customer service standards and disclosures; to provide for requirements regarding billing and other mistakes and errors; to provide for refunds and credits; to provide for administrative and civil remedies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Water Customer Bill of Rights Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback