GA HB463 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1A of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to early care and learning, so as to authorize the Department of Early Care and Learning to establish a nonprofit corporation to qualify as a public foundation; to provide for requirements; to provide for an annual report; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Early Care and Learning, Department of; establish nonprofit corporation to qualify as a public foundation; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #221 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #231 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #231 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-03-24 | Act 12 | |
2017-03-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |