GA HB461 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Heard County and to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Heard County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #182 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #172 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #172 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 110 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |