GA HB454 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Kingsland in Camden County, Georgia, approved August 15, 1927 (Ga. L. 1927, p. 1241), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 5, 1976 (Ga. L. 1976, p. 2833), so as to provide for the holding of elections in even-numbered years; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Kingsland, City of; holding of elections in even-numbered years; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 224 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House Hopper |