GA HB452 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 13 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Family Violence and Stalking Protective Order Registry, so as to provide for registration of pretrial release orders that prohibit contact with others issued in this state and in foreign courts; to revise the short title; to revise definitions; to provide for conforming references to the defined terms; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Protective Order Registry Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #361 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #255 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #249 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #255 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #249 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 222 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House Hopper |