GA HB443 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding labor and industrial relations, so as to permit employers to create and use a policy that provides preferential hiring, promoting, or retention to veterans of the armed forces of the United States; to provide for definitions; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Voluntary Veterans' Preference Employment Policy Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #234 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #215 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #215 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 92 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House Hopper |