GA HB441 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 53 of the O.C.G.A., relating to trusts, so as to establish qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions for spendthrift provisions of trusts which are not within qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; to provide for claims by creditors for such trusts; to provide for the creation of such trusts; to provide for transfers to such trusts; to provide for vacancies of trustees; to provide for standards for such trusts to be considered nonrevocable; to provide for beneficiary rights to withdrawal; to provide for claims for relief; to amend Part 4 of Article 9 of Title 11 of the O.C.G.A., relating to rights of third parties to secured transactions, so as to exclude qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts from restrictions on assignment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trusts; establish qualified self-settled spendthrift trusts; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #735 (Y: 103 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #201 (Y: 125 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #735 (Y: 103 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #598 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #201 (Y: 125 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V3 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-21 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |