GA HB441 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the administration of the budget of the Superior Court of Fulton County; to provide that the court administrator shall have oversight of the budget; to provide that the court administrator, with the approval of the chief judge, is authorized to make changes to line item appropriations; to provide that any unexpended funds at the end of the fiscal year shall lapse to the general fund of Fulton County; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County Superior Court; administrator shall have oversight of budget; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #142 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #142 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 323 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House Hopper |