GA HB437 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to require attendants at self-service motor fuel establishments to dispense motor fuel to individuals with special disabilities; to provide for related decals on pumps; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; attendants at self-service motor fuel establishments to dispense motor fuel to individuals with special disabilities; require
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #104 (Y: 142 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |