GA HB430 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to nurses, so as to provide for licensure of advanced practice registered nurses; to amend Code Section 16-13-72, Code Section 31-6-2, and Article 7 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the sale, distribution, or possession of dangerous drugs, definitions relative to state health planning and development, and home health agencies; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 and Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to prestige license plates and special plates for certain persons and vehicles and medical practice; to amend Code Section 43-26-5 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general powers and responsibilities of the Board of Nursing, so as to authorize the collection of workforce data; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; licensure of advanced practice registered nurses; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] |
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #504 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hopper |